IA SSB1040 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of an annual statewide license for a farmers market, including a license fee, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 134.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of an annual statewide license for a farmers market, including a license fee, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 134.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 134. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2023 1:00PM Room 315. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Driscoll, and Knox. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF80 (Replaced by) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
SF134 (Replaced by) 2023-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HF278 (Replaced by) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
HF661 (Replaced by) 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
SF134 (Replaced by) 2023-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HF278 (Replaced by) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
HF661 (Replaced by) 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1040 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1040.html |