IA SSB1118 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF548
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to court records for residential forcible entry and detainer actions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to court records for residential forcible entry and detainer actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 11:00AM Room G15. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., De Witt, and Quirmbach. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB43 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 548.
HF548 (Replaced by) 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HF548 (Replaced by) 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1118 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1118.html |