IA SSB1147 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF650
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Shipley.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Shipley.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of adult and minor guardianships and conservatorships.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of adult and minor guardianships and conservatorships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Shipley. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB109 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 650.
HF650 (Replaced by) 2024-01-08 - Subcommittee: Gustoff, Scheetz and Thomson, C. H.J. 9.
HF650 (Replaced by) 2024-01-08 - Subcommittee: Gustoff, Scheetz and Thomson, C. H.J. 9.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1147 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1147.html |