IA HSB109 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF650
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of adult and minor guardianships and conservatorships.(See HF 650.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of adult and minor guardianships and conservatorships.(See HF 650.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 650. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 497. |
2023-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Scheetz and Thomson, C. H.J. 207. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 205. |
2023-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1147 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Shipley.
HF650 (Replaced by) 2024-01-08 - Subcommittee: Gustoff, Scheetz and Thomson, C. H.J. 9.
HF650 (Replaced by) 2024-01-08 - Subcommittee: Gustoff, Scheetz and Thomson, C. H.J. 9.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB109 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB109.html |