IA SSB3037 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2284
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2237
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2237
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations period for executing judgments on claims for rent.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations period for executing judgments on claims for rent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2018 2:00PM RM 315 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Shipley, and Taylor. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2284 (Replaced by) 2018-03-14 - Senate amendment H-8263 filed. H.J. 591.
SF2237 (Replaced by) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 662.
HSB542 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2237 (Replaced by) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 662.
HSB542 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3037 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3037.html |