ID H0197 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ADMINISTRATIVE RULES -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding the legislative review of administrative rules.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding the legislative review of administrative rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |