ID H0387 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMUNITY COLLEGES - Amends and adds to existing law to provide for community college trustee zones and related provisions; to revise provisions regarding the addition of territory to community college districts; to revise provisions regarding trustees of Community College Districts; and to revise provisions regarding an appeal from an order of the State Board of Education.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide for community college trustee zones and related provisions; to revise provisions regarding the addition of territory to community college districts; to revise provisions regarding trustees of Community College Districts; and to revise provisions regarding an appeal from an order of the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-04 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-04 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-04 | House | PASSED -- 55-15-0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |