ID H0561 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2024 Session Law Chapter 201 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2024 Session Law Chapter 201 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide for a canvass report after votes are cast for elected offices.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for a canvass report after votes are cast for elected offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2024 Session Law Chapter 201 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:10 p.m. on March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2024-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |