ID H0646 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2024 Session Law Chapter 222 Effective: 03/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2024 Session Law Chapter 222 Effective: 03/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COUNTIES -- Amends existing law to revise the boundaries of Benewah County, Bonner County, Clearwater County, Kootenai County, Latah County, and Shoshone County.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the boundaries of Benewah County, Bonner County, Clearwater County, Kootenai County, Latah County, and Shoshone County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2024 Session Law Chapter 222 Effective: 03/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:10 p.m. on March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2024-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |