ID H0674 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules that expire on July 1, 2010, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2011, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2011, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void and of no force and effect and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules that expire on July 1, 2010, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2011, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2011, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void and of no force and effect and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-26 | To enrol | |
2010-03-25 | to House | |
2010-03-25 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-25 | McKenzie | |
2010-03-25 | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Coiner, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Geddes, Goedde, Hammond, Heinrich, Hill, Jorgenson, Kelly, Kerby(Keough), LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Pearce, Schroeder, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett(Stennett), Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Andreason Floor Sponsor | |
2010-03-25 | PASSED | |
2010-03-25 | Rls susp | |
2010-03-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-24 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-24 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-22 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-19 | to Senate | |
2010-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 58-1-11 | |
2010-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-16 | to printing | |
2010-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-16 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0674.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0674.pdf |