ID H0699 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 303 Effective: 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 303 Effective: 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EVIDENCE -- Amends existing law to prohibit disclosure of communications made during a peer support counseling session for first responders and to provide exceptions.
Title
Amends existing law to prohibit disclosure of communications made during a peer support counseling session for first responders and to provide exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 303 Effective: 03/28/2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |