ID HCR038 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:20 a.m. on March 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:20 a.m. on March 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHER EDUCATION -- States findings of the Legislature and encourages the State Board of Education to request funding for additional Idaho slots in the WWAMI Regional Medical Education Program.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and encourages the State Board of Education to request funding for additional Idaho slots in the WWAMI Regional Medical Education Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:20 a.m. on March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0 -Engelking |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 59-7-4 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |