ID HCR047 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 12:21 p.m. on March 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 12:21 p.m. on March 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RULE APPROVAL -- HOUSE REVENUE AND TAXATION AND SENATE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AND TAXATION COMMITTEES -- States findings of the Legislature and approves pending rules of the Idaho State Board of Tax Appeals reviewed by the House Revenue and Taxation Committee and the Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee, with exceptions.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and approves pending rules of the Idaho State Board of Tax Appeals reviewed by the House Revenue and Taxation Committee and the Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee, with exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 12:21 p.m. on March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-28 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-26 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-26 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |