ID HJM010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:25 a.m. on April 7, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:25 a.m. on April 7, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DEER FLAT NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE - Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting certain action by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting certain action by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:25 a.m. on April 7, 2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-31 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-31 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read in full |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | House | Hixon |
2015-03-24 | House | voice vote Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-24 | House | ADOPTED |
2015-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times |
2015-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2015/HJM010.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2015/HJM010.pdf |