ID S1098 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor on 04/20/15 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor on 04/20/15 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PARKS AND RECREATION BOARD - Amends existing law to authorize the board to enter into agreements to assist its efforts to secure long-term funding sources and to authorize the recognition of sponsors.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize the board to enter into agreements to assist its efforts to secure long-term funding sources and to authorize the recognition of sponsors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/20/15 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/09/15 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | to enrol |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Vick |
2015-04-07 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2015-04-01 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-01 | House | PASSED -- 52-17-1 |
2015-04-01 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House |
2015-03-31 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-27 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2015-02-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2015-02-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-02-26 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |