ID S1239 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 128 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 128 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY - Adds to existing law to require public notice and opportunity to comment on tentative decisions by the Department of Environmental Quality regarding Idaho Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (IPDES) permits, to provide for appeals of final decisions and for judicial review, to prohibit conflicts of interest; and to provide that provisions of Idaho's Environmental Protection and Health Act shall apply to the IPDES Program and to provide for the enforcement of pretreatment standards.
Title
Adds to existing law to require public notice and opportunity to comment on tentative decisions by the Department of Environmental Quality regarding Idaho Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (IPDES) permits, to provide for appeals of final decisions and for judicial review, to prohibit conflicts of interest; and to provide that provisions of Idaho's Environmental Protection and Health Act shall apply to the IPDES Program and to provide for the enforcement of pretreatment standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 128 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on 03/17/16 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-14 | House | PASSED -- 62-3-5 |
2016-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy, & Technology |
2016-02-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-25 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |