ID S1389 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Retained on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Retained on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS -- Amends existing law to establish provisions governing pharmacy benefit managers.
Title
Amends existing law to establish provisions governing pharmacy benefit managers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |