IL HB0280 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that whoever knowingly resists or obstructs the authorized service of an emergency order of protection granted in accordance with the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 or the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986 in any commercial building other than a residence commits a Class A misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-OBSTRUCT ORDER PROTECT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-21 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=280&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0280.htm |