IL HB0280 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that a petition for an order of protection may be filed by the State's Attorney on behalf of a person who has been abused by a family or household member. Provides that the court may, on its own motion, on behalf of a person who has been abused by a family or household member issue an order of protection. Lengthens duration of plenary order of protection in a criminal case to no longer than 10 years after sentence completion (rather than 2 years).
Title
PROTECTION ORDER-ISSUANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 112A-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=280&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0280.htm |