IL HB0288 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Silent Reflection and Student Prayer Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Student Silent Reflection Act. Allows a teacher to conduct (instead of requiring a teacher to observe) a brief period of silence at the opening of every school day with the participation of all pupils assembled. Provides that this period shall be an opportunity for such silent reflection as may be desired by each individual pupil (instead of an opportunity for silent prayer or for silent reflection on the anticipated activities of the day). Effective immediately.
Title
STUDENT SILENT REFLECTION
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Roger Eddy [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. John Fritchey [D] |
Rep. Paul Froehlich [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Held in Education | |
2009-04-29 | Held in Education | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-04-02 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-24 | First Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-19 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-033-000 | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-10 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-006-001 | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-01-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-22 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey |