IL HB0288 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the Chicago Board of Education shall require that schools provide daily recess for all students in kindergarten through grade 8. Provides that recess must be at least 10 minutes in length. Provides that if the principal determines that the weather is inclement, the principal shall direct that a recess be held indoors. Requires the principal to ensure that students are given the opportunity to engage in physical exercise during each recess. Provides that the time required for recesses is included in the minimum number of hours necessary to constitute a full day of attendance under the State aid formula provisions.
Title
SCH CD-ELEM SCH-RECESS REQ
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2012-01-30 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2012-01-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 6, 2011 |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2011-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2011-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-007-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |