IL HB0310 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 013-092-003
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 013-092-003
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 13 N: 92 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 013-092-003 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-001-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |