IL HB0336 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that drugs in the following therapeutic classes shall not be subject to prior approval as a result of the 4-prescription limit: immunosuppressant drugs, oncolytic drugs, anti-retroviral drugs, "antipsychotic drugs, and, on or after July 1, 2015, anti-depressant and anti-anxiety drugs" (rather than immunosuppressant drugs, oncolytic drugs, anti-retroviral drugs, and, on or after July 1, 2014, antipsychotic drugs). Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-RX LIMITS-EXEMPTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=336&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0336.htm |