IL HB0422 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging, the Disabled Persons Rehabilitation Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Regarding services under the Community Care Program (CCP), the Home Services Program, the supportive living facilities program, and the nursing home prescreening project, provides that individuals with a score of 29 or higher based on the determination of need assessment tool shall be eligible to receive institutional and home and community-based long term care services until the State receives federal approval and implements an updated assessment tool, and those individuals are found to be ineligible under that updated assessment tool. Requires the Department on Aging and the Departments of Human Services and Healthcare and Family Services to adopt rules, but not emergency rules, regarding the updated assessment tool. Contains provisions concerning continued eligibility for persons made ineligible for services under the updated assessment tool. Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Prohibits the Department on Aging from adopting any rule that: (i) restricts eligibility under CCP to persons who qualify for medical assistance; or (ii) establishes a separate program of home and community-based long term care services for persons eligible for CCP services but not eligible for medical assistance. Prohibits the Department from increasing copayment levels under CCP to those levels in effect on January 1, 2016. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Deletes a provision concerning an increase in the determination of need scores, on and after July 1, 2012, from 29 to 37. Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Prohibits the involuntary discharge of an individual receiving care in an institutional setting as the result of the updated assessment tool until a transition plan has been developed. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-DHS-DHFS-DON SCORES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | To Public Benefits Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2405 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=422&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0422.htm |