IL HB0436 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person who drives or is in actual control of a motor vehicle upon the public highways of this State and who has been involved in a fatal motor vehicle accident shall be deemed to have given consent, regardless of whether an arrest takes place, to tests of blood, breath, or urine to detect alcohol, drugs, or intoxicating compounds. Provides that both a test of the concentration of alcohol in the person's breath and a test of blood or urine for the purpose of determining the content of alcohol, drugs, or intoxicating compounds of the person's blood shall be administered. Provides that the required tests be conducted within one hour of the arrival of law enforcement personnel at the scene of the accident or, if the driver has fled the scene of the accident, within one hour of apprehending the driver.
Title
VEH CD-MANDATORY ALCOHOL TESTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-501.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=436&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0436.htm |