IL HB0489 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code, the Children's Health Insurance Program Act, the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act, and the Public Aid Code. Allows a medical or health care provider who participates under the Children's Health Insurance Program Act, the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act, or the Public Aid Code to elect, in lieu of receiving direct payment for goods or services provided, to participate in the health care provider deferred compensation plan. Requires the State Board of Investment to develop and establish and the Department of Central Management Services to administer a deferred compensation plan for health care providers under the same terms and conditions as the State Employee Deferred Compensation Plan. Provides that a medical or health care provider who elects to participate in the plan does not have a cause of action against the State for any damages allegedly suffered by the provider as a result of any delay by the State in crediting the amount of any contribution to the provider's plan account. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
MEDICAL PROVIDER DEFERRED COMP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-30 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-03 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0806 | |
2009-11-03 | Effective Date July 1, 2010 | |
2009-10-30 | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses | |
2009-10-30 | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 055-000-000 | |
2009-10-30 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2009-10-28 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 28, 2009 | |
2009-10-14 | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-10-14 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2009-10-13 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-10-05 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-001 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-21 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-30 | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-04-28 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2009-04-28 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-24 | First Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-003 | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |