IL HB0621 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0564
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that a township may provide for the cutting of grass, the trimming of trees or bushes, and the removal of nuisance trees or bushes (in addition to the cutting of weeds and the maintenance of a retention pond or detention pond). Provides for a lien and recovery of costs. Provides that the lien must be filed within 180 days (instead of 60 days) after the township or a person performing the service by authority of the township incurs the cost of performing the service. Provides that, in addition to any lien or foreclosure action, a township may institute a civil action or proceeding to recover the amount of money owed for the performance of specified services. Effective immediately.
Title
TOWNSHIP CODE-WEED CUTTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-18 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0564 | |
2009-08-18 | Effective Date August 18, 2009 | |
2009-08-18 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Local Government | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass Local Government; 006-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Counties & Townships Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |