IL HB0621 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the credit for wages paid to qualified veterans also extends to wages paid to a qualified veteran's spouse. Provides that active duty members of the United States Armed Forces are also considered "qualified veterans". Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-VETERAN'S SPOUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=621&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0621.htm |