IL HB0836 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that the determination of eligibility for special education shall be made and the Individualized Education Program meeting shall be completed within 60 calendar (instead of school) days from the date of written parental consent.
Title
SCH CD-SPEC ED-IEP MEETING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=836&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0836.htm |