IL HB0921 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0748
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0748
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Physical Fitness Facility Medical Emergency Preparedness Act; provides that a physical fitness facility must ensure that there is a trained automated external defibrillator (AED) user on staff "during staffed business hours". Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Requires each dental office in the State to develop and implement an emergency medical plan. Requires all dental offices that administer anesthesia or sedation to contain at least one AED on the premises at all times. Provides that the owner of a dental office is responsible for complying with these requirements. Amends the Physical Fitness Services Act; provides that a physical fitness center shall have available and on its premises, during staffed business hours (instead of at all times during which members of such physical fitness center or other persons are engaged in physical fitness activities or receiving physical fitness services), at least one person who holds a valid certificate indicating that he or she has successfully completed a course of training in basic cardiopulmonary resuscitation.
Title
PHYSICAL FITNESS-DENTISTS-AED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0748 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-001-001 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-20 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-20 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2009 | |
2009-05-18 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 010-000-000 | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-04-23 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-27 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 | |
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |