OH SB63 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Referred to committee: Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Referred to committee: Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 2307.931 of the Revised Code to require a plaintiff in a tort action alleging an asbestos claim to file specified disclosures.
Title
Require plaintiff in asbestos claim to file specified disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Insurance |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Recommitted: Insurance |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Reported: Insurance |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Health and Human Services
House Insurance Committee
Senate Insurance Committee
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Health and Human Services
House Insurance Committee
Senate Insurance Committee