IL HB0945 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Prohibits the Chicago Board of Education from establishing or operating a contract school. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CHI-PROHIB-CONTRACT SCH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-04-22 | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-03 | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=945&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0945.htm |