IL HB1045 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Consolidation Commission Act of 2011. Extends the final report date to September 30, 2013. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV CONSOLIDATION-REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0124 |
2013-08-02 | House | Effective Date August 2, 2013 |
2013-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-001-000 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3987 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |