IL HB1175 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0892
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0892
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Student-Athlete Endorsement Rights Act. Permits a student athlete to retain an agent (instead of certified agent) for any matter or activity relating to compensation for the use of the name, image, likeness, or voice of the student athlete while enrolled at a postsecondary educational institution. Requires a student athlete to provide the postsecondary educational institution with written notice and a copy of any agreement entered into for professional representation in a manner and time prescribed by the institution (rather than within 7 days). Requires a student athlete to provide to the postsecondary educational institution any written contract for publicity rights in a manner and at a time prescribed by the institution (rather than prior to the execution of the agreement and before any compensation is provided to the student athlete). Provides that compensation for a student athlete's name, image, likeness, or voice shall not be conditioned on the athletic performance (rather than performance or attendance) at a particular postsecondary educational institution. Provides that a postsecondary educational institution is not required to directly or indirectly identify, create, facilitate, arrange, negotiate, or otherwise enable opportunities for a prospective or current student athlete to enter into a publicity rights agreement with a third party (instead or prohibiting a postsecondary educational institution from directly or indirectly arranging for a third party to provide compensation to, or entering into a publicity rights agreement with, a prospective or current student athlete). Adds a provision encouraging postsecondary educational institutions to provide financial literacy, brand management, and life skills programming designed for student athletes. Makes other changes.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0892 |
2022-05-20 | House | Effective Date May 20, 2022; - The effective date of P.A. 102-892 is set forth in P.A. 102-891 |
2022-05-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-003-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-017-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 007-003-000 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-03-17 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2021-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 25 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |