IL HB1192 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that, in accordance with a license issued under the Act, alcoholic liquor may be sold, served, or delivered in buildings and facilities under the control of the Department of Natural Resources during events or activities lasting 7 continuous days upon the written approval of the Director of Natural Resources acting as the controlling government authority. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR - DNR FACILITIES
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0167 |
2011-07-22 | House | Effective Date July 22, 2011 |
2011-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-008-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-001-002 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-032-000 |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |