IL HB1192 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a requirement that a municipality in a county with 2,000,000 or more inhabitants must regulate and inspect retail food establishments does not apply to a municipality that is served by a local health district. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-FOOD ESTABLISHMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0193 |
2013-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2013 |
2013-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-20-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |