IL HB1284 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $14,500,000 from the Local Government Road Salt Purchase Reimbursement Fund to the Department of Transportation for the purpose of providing grants to counties, municipalities, townships, and road districts for road salt reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
$IDOT-ROAD SALT
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Karen May [D] |
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Kathleen Ryg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1284&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/PDF/09600HB1284.pdf |