IL HB1284 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Exclusive Provider Benefit Plan Act. Provides that an exclusive provider benefit plan that meets the requirements of the Act shall be permitted. Provides that to the extent of any conflict between the provision permitting exclusive provider benefit plans and any other statutory provision, the provision permitting exclusive provider benefit plans prevails over the conflicting provision. Provides that an insurer duly licensed under the laws of this State may offer exclusive provider benefit plans to individuals and group health plans in conformity with the terms set forth in the provision concerning the applicability of the Act. Provides that an insurer shall not be required to be licensed as an HMO under the Health Maintenance Organization Act in order to offer exclusive provider benefit plans under the provision concerning the applicability of the Act. Sets forth provisions concerning the applicability of the Health Carrier External Review Act; the construction of the Exclusive Provider Benefit Plan Act; providing information to enrollees and prospective enrollees; the availability of exclusive providers; notice of nonrenewal or termination; transitions of service and continuity of care; prohibitions; exclusive provider benefit plan's access to specialists; health care services appeals, complaints, and external independent reviews; emergency services prior to stabilization; post-stabilization medical services; quality assessment programs; utilization review; and qualifying examinations of insurers and fees. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to establish an exemption for all identified or deidentified health information due to the Department's administration of the Exclusive Provider Benefit Plan Act. Effective immediately.
Title
EXCLUSIVE PROVIDER BNFT PLANS
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 026-000-000 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1284&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1284.htm |