IL HB1355 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that employers with fewer than 25 employees are exempt from paying estimated taxes and may pay their unemployment insurance contributions and submit their wage and contribution reports on an annual basis (instead of quarterly). Effective immediately.
Title
ESTIMATED TAX-UNEMPLOY INSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-05-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2011-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-020-000 |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hunter |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-004-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Withdrawn Rep. Karen May |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Karen May |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
2011-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-13 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-17 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
2011-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1400.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |