IL HB1437 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Criminal Sentencing Impact Note Act. Provides that every bill, the purpose or effect of which is to have a disparate impact on the criminal offender population and its racial and ethnic composition, shall have prepared for it a brief explanatory statement or note that shall include a reliable estimate of the anticipated impact on the racial and ethnic composition of the criminal offender population. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall prepare the statement or note. Sets forth the contents of the statement or note addressing the disparate impact. Defines "criminal offender population". Contains other related provisions regarding the vote on the necessity of the note, comment or opinion regarding the merits of the legislation included in the note, and appearance of State officials and employees in support or opposition of measure.
Title
CRIM SENTENCING IMPACT NOTE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0666 |
2016-07-29 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |