IL HB1450 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district must spend at least 65% of its total operating expenditures on direct classroom expenditures, and if a school district's direct classroom expenditures for the 2013-2014 school year are less than 65% of its total operating expenditures, then the district must increase its direct classroom expenditures by at least 2 percentage points per school year beginning with the 2014-2015 school year until at least 65% of the district's total operating expenditures are spent on direct classroom expenditures. Provides that a school district that is unable to meet these expenditure standards due to special circumstances may apply to the State Superintendent of Education for a one-year, renewable waiver. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-BUDGET-CLASSROOM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 17-1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-43.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 170 | 4.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 170 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1450&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1450.htm |