IL HB1472 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In the provision defining "eligible employment" for the purpose of allowing a teacher to return to teaching in subject shortage areas without impairing his or her retirement status or retirement annuity, changes the ending date of the employment from no later than June 30, 2019 to no later than June 30, 2021. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase". Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-DOWNST TEACHER-SHORTAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0049 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-150.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |