IL HB1485 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging, the Children and Family Services Act, the Department of Human Services Act, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, and the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department on Aging, the Department of Children and Family Services, the Department of Human Services, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and the Department of Public Health shall have the authority and are hereby directed to collaboratively adopt joint rules to establish (i) a cross-agency prequalification process for contracting with privately owned or operated human service providers; (ii) a cross-agency master service agreement of standard terms and conditions for contracting with privately owned or operated human service providers; and (iii) a cross-agency common service taxonomy for human service providers to streamline the processes outlined in the amendatory Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall be the lead agency in this matter. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-CROSS AGENCY AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0210 |
2011-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2011 |
2011-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2011-02-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02f | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1305 | 1-37a | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2205 | 2205-15a | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-12a | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 505 | 37a | New Code | See Bill Text |