IL HB1485 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code and the Illinois Parentage Act of 1984. Provides that an administrative determination of paternity that is not based on a voluntary acknowledgment of paternity made in accordance with the Illinois Public Aid Code may be challenged in court on the basis of fraud, duress, or material mistake of fact, with the burden of proof upon the challenging party and that, pending the outcome of the challenge to the administrative determination of paternity, the legal responsibilities of the parties shall remain in full force and effect, except upon order of the court upon a showing of good cause. Provides that DNA evidence that a man who has been found to be the father of a child under an administrative determination of paternity is not the natural father of the child constitutes a material mistake of fact. Provides that an action under the new provisions is barred if brought more than 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act or more than 2 years after the petitioner obtains actual knowledge of the relevant facts, whichever is later, and that the 2-year period for bringing an action shall not extend beyond the date on which the child reaches the age of 18 years. Effective immediately.
Title
PARENTAGE-ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Brown [R] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0471 |
2015-08-27 | House | Effective Date August 27, 2015 |
2015-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-07-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-06-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-06-23 | House | House Concurs |
2015-06-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-000-000 |
2015-06-23 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-06-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000 |
2015-06-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-06-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-06-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-06-22 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 10-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 45 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 45 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |