IL HB1485 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $7,940,486 and any prior year costs from the Illinois Habitat Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for the preservation and maintenance of high quality habitat lands in accordance with the provisions of the Habitat Endowment Act. Appropriates $2,718,401 and any prior year costs from the Illinois Habitat Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for the preservation and maintenance of a high quality fish and wildlife habitat and to promote the heritage of outdoor sports in Illinois from revenue derived from the sale of Sportsmen Series license plates. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
$DNR-HABITAT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Capital Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1485&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB1485.pdf |