IL HB1517 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that moneys in the Fraternal Order of Police Fund shall be paid to a specified entity subject to appropriation by the General Assembly and distribution by the Secretary of State.
Title
VEH CD-FRATERNAL POLICE PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2013 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-000 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 019-000-000 |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-691 | Amended Code | Citation Text |