IL HB1531 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Park District Act. Provides that the Chicago Park District may not prohibit licensed medical personnel from using appropriate medical equipment, including needles, to administer vaccinations as part of a health related program or fair held on property owned or leased by the Chicago Park District. Effective immediately.
Title
CHICAGO PARK DIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0211 |
2011-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2011 |
2011-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2011 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 31, 2011 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |