IL HB1555 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Illinois Transparency and Accountability Portal (ITAP) shall include information on the employees and individual consultants, expenditures, grant funds received, contracts of all units of local government with taxing powers, and unfunded obligations of the State. Defines "unit of local government". Provides that ITAP shall include information on the funding ratio and the rate of return on investment for local pension funds and the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
ITAP-LOCAL TAXING BODIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000 |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |