IL HB1638 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to receive the approval of the General Assembly prior to applying for any waiver to reduce or eliminate the State's responsibility to provide emergency or non-emergency ambulance services to Medicaid beneficiaries. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-AMBULANCE SERVICES
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |