IL HB1661 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2012, the physician fee schedule for the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Program and for pediatric physician specialists under the medical assistance program must increase to become competitive with those of non-governmental, third-party health insurance programs. Provides that by January 1, 2015, the payment for a pediatric specialty physician service must not be lower than Medicare reimbursement in accordance with the Medicare payment localities for Illinois. Provides that the Department shall annually increase pediatric specialty physician payments under the provisions of the Act by an amount approximately equal to one-third of the difference between the actual rates available for such purposes on January 1, 2011 and the Medicare reimbursement rates effective on January 1, 2011. Makes other changes.
Title
INS-PEDIATRIC SPECIALIST FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 170 | 52.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1661&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1661.htm |